PIRRIE HALL AND RECREATION GROUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity owns and maintains the village hall and recreation ground for the benefit of those resident in the village and the surrounding area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Surrey
Governance
- 15 November 1961: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emily Sarah Bourne | Chair | 20 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Guy Thompson | Trustee | 16 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Christopher Langan | Trustee | 30 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP ALASTAIR COLVILE GREIG | Trustee | 01 December 2008 |
|
|
||||
STEPHANIE ISABELLE VAN BOOTE | Trustee | 10 December 2005 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD CHARLES EDWARD SOUTHWELL | Trustee | 01 October 2003 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.92k | £14.62k | £39.76k | £33.10k | £42.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.54k | £12.92k | £22.88k | £31.16k | £46.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 14 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 19 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 04 May 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 23 MAY 1923.
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE SOCIAL AND CULTURAL AMENITIES FOR THE INHABITANTS OF BROOK, SANDHILLS AND DISTRICT
Area of benefit
BROOK, SANDHILLS AND DISTRICT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pirrie Hall
Haslemere Road
Brook
GODALMING
GU8 5UJ
- Phone:
- 01428684079
- Email:
- hallmanager@pirriehall.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window