WOODSTOCK RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Most of our funds are either raised through holding coffee mornings or donations. We then distribute to elderly people (residing in Woodstock) at Christmas, in the form of vouchers, e.g. Co-Op food vouchers. Occasionally we will make a donation to the local almshouses & elderly residential community sheltered housing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 05 June 1977: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sandra Linden Rasch | Chair | 01 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Michael Graham | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Elizabeth Margaret Embree Poskitt | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|||||
ELAINE STOKES | Trustee | 15 May 2019 |
|
|||||
KAREN KINCH | Trustee | 19 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
BEVERLEY ANNE HOARE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GWENDA MARY MASON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PATRICIA TURNER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £777 | £1.27k | £254 | £1.15k | £1.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £465 | £250 | £250 | £350 | £250 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 5 OCTOBER 1977
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF WOODSTOCK WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF WOODSTOCK
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 PLANE TREE WAY
WOODSTOCK
OX20 1PG
- Phone:
- 01993811473
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window