Accounts and annual returns THE RIDDELL MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 200680
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 04 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 20 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2023 10 January 2025 285 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2022 14 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 11 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 11 November 2021 225 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required