RENAISSANCE THEATRE TRUST COMPANY LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Disbursed -ú3297.60 in grants and -ú1820.00 in bursaries.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Cumbria
Governance
- 30 October 1961: Standard registration
- 09 September 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- RENAISSANCE ARTS (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £726 | £545 | £392 | £378 | £324 | |
|
Total expenditure | £45 | £75 | £120 | £302 | £5.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 26 January 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 25 January 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 JANUARY 1961 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 17 APRIL 1961
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION, PARTICULARLY BY THE PRODUCTION OF EDUCATIONAL PLAYS AND THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS, INCLUDING THE ARTS OF DRAMA, MIME, DANCE, SINGING AND MUSIC AND TO FORMULATE PREPARE AND ESTABLISH SCHEMES THEREFOR PROVIDED THAT ALL OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY SHALL BE OF A CHARITABLE NATURE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window