Accounts and annual returns THE FARRIERS LODGE BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 200689
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 04 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2023 04 August 2024 126 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2022 04 May 2023 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 19 April 2022 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 06 April 2021 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required