EVERSHOLT PAROCHIAL CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The upkeep of the Parish Church, relief of local people in need and the general benefit of the inhabitants of the Village of Evershott in such manner as the trustees think fit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 21 November 1961: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Collier | Chair | 09 January 2012 |
|
|||||
Sarah Denton | Trustee | 21 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Collin | Trustee | 08 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Hood | Trustee | 18 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE DOHERTY | Trustee | 13 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nathalie Muller | Trustee | 01 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
JULIE MARGARET TODD | Trustee | 29 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
STEVEN SMITH | Trustee | 18 June 2005 |
|
|
||||
PATRICK RICHARDSON | Trustee |
|
||||||
ANNA BLOMFIELD | Trustee |
|
||||||
CAROLYN HOWELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £94.96k | £84.14k | £109.26k | £120.84k | £126.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £65.12k | £60.51k | £146.36k | £71.77k | £79.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.90k | £213 | £213 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 03 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
REGULATED BY SCHEME OF 3RD OCTOBER 1991
Charitable objects
1)UPKEEP AND REPAIR OF THE FABRIC OF THE PARISH CHURCH.2)RELIEF OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISH WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED,HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS,AND IN EXCEPTIONAL CASES THOSE RESIDENT IMMEDIATELY OUTSIDE THE PARISH.3)ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF EVERSHOLT
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 BLOOMSBURY CLOSE
WOBURN
MILTON KEYNES
MK17 9QS
- Phone:
- 01525290458
- Email:
- eversholtcharity@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window