Trustees EVERSHOLT PAROCHIAL CHARITY
Charity Number: 200693

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Collier | Chair | 09 January 2012 |
|
|||||
Sarah Denton | Trustee | 21 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Collin | Trustee | 08 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Hood | Trustee | 18 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE DOHERTY | Trustee | 13 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nathalie Muller | Trustee | 01 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
JULIE MARGARET TODD | Trustee | 29 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
STEVEN SMITH | Trustee | 18 June 2005 |
|
|
||||
PATRICK RICHARDSON | Trustee |
|
||||||
ANNA BLOMFIELD | Trustee |
|
||||||
CAROLYN HOWELL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.