BOXMOOR AND BERKHAMSTED (POST OFFICE) BENEVOLENT SOCIETY

Charity Number: 200710
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

ASSISTANCE TO FORMER AND CURRENT POST OFFICE WORKERS INCLUDING BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £2,627
Total expenditure: £28,599

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Bedford
  • Buckinghamshire
  • Central Bedfordshire
  • Hertfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 November 1961: Standard registration
  • 09 September 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 25 August 2015: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
VALERIE COLLINS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.27k £7.49k £321 £1.71k £2.63k
Total expenditure £18.92k £12.86k £2.36k £3.18k £28.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 25 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 25 November 2024 299 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 22 November 2024 661 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 March 2022 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 24 March 2021 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
HOMELAND
HEMPSTEAD ROAD
BOVINGDON
HEMEL HEMPSTEAD
HP3 0HF
Phone:
01442269527
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available