THE SOUTH MOLTON COTTAGE HOMES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
South Molton Cottage Homes provides accommodation for elderly people who have lived in the area for at least 5 years. There are eight cottages, 4 for single occupancy and 4 for couples. All are occupied at the present time.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
Governance
- 22 December 1961: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR STEVE WHITE | Chair | 29 May 2014 |
|
|||||
Ernest John Moore | Trustee | 29 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev Dr Frederick Michael Grandey | Trustee | 15 August 2015 |
|
|||||
LYN WINTER | Trustee | 30 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
MR CLAUDE SQUIRE | Trustee | 29 May 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.93k | £35.59k | £40.04k | £40.93k | £67.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.02k | £29.25k | £18.13k | £24.74k | £17.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF HIGH COURT OF JUSTICE OF 23RD JUNE 1930 VARIED BY SCHEMES OF 11TH AUGUST 1970 AND 28TH MARCH 1972 AND 12TH NOVEMBER 1990 AS AMENDED ON 18 OCT 2017 as amended on 10 Jun 2021 as amended on 21 Feb 2024
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF HOMES FOR POOR SINGLE PERSONS OF AT LEAST 60 YEARS OF AGE AND POOR MARRIED COUPLES AT LEAST ONE OF WHOM SHALL BE AT LEAST 60 YEARS OF AGE AND WHO(EXCEPT IN SPECIAL CASES TO BE APPROVED BY THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS) ARE TO BE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF SOUTH MOLTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
CROSSEVIEW
40 Brook Meadow
SOUTH MOLTON
EX36 4BN
- Phone:
- 01769573558
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window