THOMAS STANLEY SHIPMAN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ASSISTANCE FOR THE RELIEF OF P0VERTY AND GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF RESIDENTS OF THE CITY AND COUNTY OF LEICESTER
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Leicester City
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 08 November 1961: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HUGH COLIN STEVENSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Paul Brian Douglas Murray | Trustee | 25 November 2019 |
|
|||||
PETER DOLEMAN | Trustee | 10 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARK THOMAS NEWBY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £58.01k | £47.96k | £63.34k | £54.57k | £54.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £71.35k | £68.52k | £68.57k | £87.44k | £46.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 24 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 24 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED DATED 31 AUGUST 1961
Charitable objects
TO PAY OR APPLY THE INCOME FOR SUCH CHARITABLE OBJECTS, PURPOSES OR INSTITUTIONS AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT. THE INCOME MAY BE USED FOR THE PURPOSE OF RELIEVING POVERTY BY GRANT OF PENSIONS AND OTHERWISE; TO BENEFIT ALSO EMPLOYEES OR EX-EMPLOYEES OF THE COMPANY.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
DOWER HOUSE
GOADBY
LEICESTER
LE7 9EE
- Phone:
- 07980451336
- Email:
- info@tsstrust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window