CALVERTON ALMSHOUSES CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
This Charity as 3 Almshouses properties and the area of benefit to be considered for one of these properties is the Parishes of Calverton, Stony Stratford and Beachampton
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Buckinghamshire
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 22 December 1961: Standard registration
- CALVERTON ALMSHOUSES CHARITY (Working name)
- CHARITY OF THE HONOURABLE AND REVEREND CHARLES GEORGE PERCEVAL (Previous name)
- Homes England
- Complaints handling
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Patricia Stafford | Chair | 28 November 2019 |
|
|||
Rev Jacqueline Dove | Trustee | 16 February 2022 |
|
|||
Andrew Jones | Trustee | 18 January 2022 |
|
|||
John Beatty | Trustee | 17 June 2015 |
|
|||
FRANCIS JAMES FRANKLIN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.99k | £29.13k | £20.62k | £20.88k | £9.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.02k | £20.40k | £11.43k | £15.71k | £10.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £30.00k | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 August 2024 | 183 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 13 JAN 1977 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 27 SEP 2000 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 30 MAR 2020
Charitable objects
ALMSHOUSES FOR THE RESIDENCE OF POOR AGED PERSONS WHO ARE MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND RESIDENT IN THE THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS, CALVERTON, PROVIDED THAT EVERY EIGHTH VACANCY IN THE ALMSHOUSES SHALL BE ALLOCATED TO AN APPLICANT OTHERWISE DULY QUALIFIED WHO IS RESIDENT IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST.MARY THE VIRGIN, BEACHAMPTON. IF AT ANY TIME THERE IS A VACANCY FOR AN ALMSPERSON AND THERE IS NO DULY QUALIFIED APPLICANT WHO IS RESIDENT IN EITHER OF THE SAID ECCLESIASTICAL PARISHES THE TRUSTEES MAY APPOINT A POOR PERSON OTHERWISE DULY QUALIFIED WHO IS RESIDENT IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. GILES WITH ST.MARY THE VIRGIN, STONY STRATFORD, IN THE COUNTY OF BUCKINGHAMSHIRE.THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE APPLIED FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE ALMSPEOPLE OF THE CHARITY OR ANY OF THEM IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF CALVERTON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
78 LONDON ROAD
STONY STRATFORD
MILTON KEYNES
MK11 1JH
- Phone:
- 01908563350
- Email:
- karen.phillips440@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window