THE NORTH STAFFORDSHIRE MEDICAL INSTITUTE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote and advance the study and general knowledge of science & medicine and all matters relating to the progress and development of all branches of medicine and surgery and for that purpose to establish, facilities for medical and scientific reseach, and buildings for postgraduate medical and dental teaching.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 01 November 1967: Standard registration
- 29 March 2019: Funds received from 277099 THE WADE CHARITABLE TRUST
- NORTH STAFFS CONFERENCES (Working name)
- The Wade Charitable Foundation (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebecca Poppleton | Trustee | 05 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Lucy Watkinson LlB | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Andrew Finney | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Abigail Victoria Roberts | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Dominic Laszlo Paul DeTakats | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mary McCarthy | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Nachiappan Chockalingam | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Ian Cotterill | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Murray Brunt | Trustee | 12 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Pensee Wu | Trustee | 07 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARK WILLIAM BARNISH FCA DChA | Trustee | 10 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr Katie Maddock | Trustee | 07 November 1988 |
|
|
||||
BRYAN CHARLES CARNES MBE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr CLARE BANKS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £239.20k | £162.99k | £222.15k | £260.83k | £360.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £398.56k | £294.92k | £412.10k | £283.16k | £369.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £43.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10/10/1961 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/09/1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/09/1993 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 16/10/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12 NOV 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE STUDY AND GENERAL KNOWLEDGE OF SCIENCE AND MEDICINE AND ALL MATTERS RELATING TO THE PROGRESS AND DEVELOPMENT OF ALL BRANCHES OF MEDICINE AND SURGERY AND FOR THAT PURPOSE TO ESTABLISH FORM AND EQUIP AND MAINTAIN A MEDICAL LIBRARY AND LABORATORIES WITH FACILITIES FOR MEDICAL AND SCIENTIFIC RESEARCH, AND BUILDINGS FOR POST GRADUATE MEDICAL TEACHING.
Area of benefit
NORTH STAFFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
NORTH STAFFORDSHIRE MEDICAL INSTITU
HARTSHILL ROAD
STOKE-ON-TRENT
ST4 7NY
- Phone:
- 01782714888
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window