MABEL GALE BEQUEST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Mabel Gale Bequest maintains 12 one bedroomed flats and surrounding gardens for elderly poor ladies in Bridport, Dorset.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Dorset
Governance
- 22 December 1961: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sandra Brown | Chair |
|
||||||
Richard Lewington | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Morse | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Woodroffe | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Weston | Trustee | 12 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
TRACY SCAMMELL | Trustee | 21 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JOHN CONROY M.C. | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.87k | £33.28k | £34.76k | £39.36k | £39.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.80k | £37.09k | £29.19k | £35.25k | £40.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL OF MABEL GALE DATED 6TH DECEMBER 1957.
Charitable objects
TO ERECT & MAINTAIN HOMES FOR AGED POOR FEMALES WHO SHALL HAVE RESIDED IN THE BOROUGH OF BRIDPORT FOR AT LEAST TEN YEARS AND SHALL BE AT LEAST 65 YEARS OF AGE.
Area of benefit
BRIDPORT
Contact information
- Address:
-
KITSON & TROTMAN
THE CHAMPIONS
BEAMINSTER
DT8 3AN
- Phone:
- 01308862313
- Email:
- g.randall@ktlaw.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window