THE DUNSTER ALMSHOUSE CHARITY

Charity number: 200861
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of Almshouses to residents of the Parish over 50

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £8,361
Total expenditure: £4,249

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 January 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • DUNSTER ALMSHOUSE CHARITY (Working name)
  • DUNSTER'S ALMSHOUSE (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Warren Tom Ridings Trustee 06 May 2025
None on record
TIM FARLEY Trustee 30 September 2014
None on record
ANTHONY TAYLOR Trustee 01 January 2014
THE DONYATT RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
ANDREW MARTIN WATSON Trustee 01 January 2013
THE DONYATT RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £8.59k £8.13k £8.54k £8.18k £8.36k
Total expenditure £3.71k £6.68k £4.00k £4.27k £4.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 23 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 30 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 09 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 10 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
SMITHY COTTAGE
DONYATT
ILMINSTER
TA19 0RW
Phone:
0146055673
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available