WOODROFFE AND TUCKER'S CHARITIES (KNOWN AS CANDLEMAS MONEY)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of need, generally or individually, in the old parish of Maddington and those parishes which are adjacent to its boundary, namely Shrewton, Orcheston, Tilshead, Chitterne, Orcheston, Wylye, Berwick St James and Winterbourne Stoke
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 21 March 1962: Standard registration
- MADDINGTON CANDLEMASS CHARITY (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas Sage | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Ann Berry | Trustee | 10 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
REV Eleanor Rance MA AKC | Trustee | 01 May 2014 |
|
|||||
RONALD JAMES LOCK | Trustee | 16 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
JANET BLAKE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.72k | £10.34k | £8.78k | £10.11k | £10.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.56k | £7.39k | £11.83k | £9.98k | £9.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 02 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 31 May 2024 | 92 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 20 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 24 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
UNREPORTED VOLUME. 105 P.424.P.R. 26. P 483. SCHEME SEALED 14TH JUNE 1995.
Charitable objects
GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE POOR.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF MADDINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Chanters
The Hollow
Shrewton
SALISBURY
SP3 4JY
- Phone:
- 01980620934
- Email:
- ron.lock@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window