ADDERBURY FEOFFEE CHARITY

Charity number: 200902
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Acts to distribute income from investment and land to three groups in the parishes of Adderbury and Milton viz: the Ecclesiastical Clause, the Educational clause and the Needy Clause.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £111,354
Total expenditure: £85,159

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Oxfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 December 1961: Standard registration
  • 30 January 2008: Removed (Registered in error)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ADDERBURY & MILTON FEOFFEES (Working name)
  • ADDERBURY AND MILTON FEORFEES (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrew John Buchanan Trustee 11 July 2023
None on record
Lucy Katherine Anne Wells Trustee 08 February 2022
None on record
Rev Elizabeth Ann Simpson Trustee 15 September 2020
ADDERBURY PARISH INSTITUTE
Received: On time
Patricia Ann Leeman Trustee 10 December 2014
None on record
Graham Stephens Trustee 10 December 2014
None on record
Susan Elizabeth Jelfs Trustee 29 October 2013
None on record
EDWARD FROST Trustee 25 April 2012
None on record
MARGARET CLINKARD Trustee
None on record
SEBASTIAN PEISSELL Trustee
None on record
ROBERT ERNEST COOKE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £9.04k £29.38k £35.75k £119.71k £111.35k
Total expenditure £8.39k £20.73k £49.87k £94.76k £85.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 12 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 12 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 19 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 19 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 31 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 14 NOVEMBER 1952
Charitable objects
INCOME TO BE APPLIED TOWARDS MEETING THE COST OF MAINTAINING AND REPAIRING THE CHURCHES OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARY ADDERBURY AND ST. JOHN THE BAPTIST, MILTON.
Area of benefit
ECCLESIASTICAL PARISHES OF ST. MARY AND ST. JOHN THE BAPTIST
Registration history
  • 22 December 1961 : Standard registration
  • 30 January 2008 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
The Barn
Croft Lane
Adderbury
OX17 3NB
Phone:
01295981930
Website:

n.a