OVER STOWEY PAROCHIAL CHARITIES

Charity number: 200950
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH OR SAVING OF LIVES AND THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY, FOR THE ELDERLY OR PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES. THE CHARITY MAKES GRANTS TO INDIVIDUALS.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £932
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 December 1961: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev ELEANOR OLWEN KING Chair 13 August 2018
THE JAMES RICH SUNDAY SCHOOL CHARITY
Received: On time
ALISON HOARE Trustee 14 December 2004
THE JAMES RICH SUNDAY SCHOOL CHARITY
Received: On time
PETER HIGGINSON Trustee 03 December 1990
THE JAMES RICH SUNDAY SCHOOL CHARITY
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF OVER STOWEY CHURCH
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £905 £1.00k £905 £905 £932
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 10 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 28 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 9 SEPT. 1932
Charitable objects
BENEFIT OF POOR OF THE PARISH.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF OVER STOWEY
Registration history
  • 22 December 1961 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
BINCOMBE TOPS
BINCOMBE
OVER STOWEY
BRIDGWATER
TA5 1HR
Phone:
01278732102
Website:

No information available