CHARITY OF SUSAN BOURNE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of poverty
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 January 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 22 December 1961: Standard registration
- 11 November 2008: Removed (Does not operate)
- 16 February 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Corinne Kennedy | Trustee | 07 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Gary Green | Trustee | 12 February 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/01/2020 | 01/01/2021 | 01/01/2022 | 01/01/2023 | 01/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50 | £60 | £70 | £80 | £92 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 January 2024 | 14 November 2024 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2023 | 14 November 2024 | 379 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2022 | 14 November 2024 | 744 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2021 | 14 November 2024 | 1109 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2020 | 14 November 2024 | 1474 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED AT WORCESTER 22 JUNE 1864
Charitable objects
INCOME TO BE APPLIED ON THE 25 OCTOBER YEARLY FO EVER,IN CLOTHING, OR RELIEF IN MONEY, OR BOTH TO SUCH OF THE SICK AND AFFLICTED AND OTHER POOR PERSONS OF AND BELONGING TO THE PARISH OF GRIMLEY AS THE VICAR SHOULD IN HIS DISCRETION THINK PROPER OBJESTS AND IN NEED OF THE SAME.
Area of benefit
GRIMLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Woodcote
Monkwood Green
Hallow
WORCESTER
WR2 6NX
- Phone:
- 07785715310
- Email:
- gng2501@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window