BROADHEMBURY CHARITIES THE POOR'S MONEY

Charity number: 201014
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To apply the yearly income of the charities for the benefit of the poor of the parish of Broadhembury.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £574
Total expenditure: £125

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 December 1961: Standard registration
  • 17 December 1995: Removed
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • BROADHEMBURY CHARITIES (Working name)
  • THE BROADHEMBURY CHARITIES FOR THE POOR (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Jane Rachel Penn Chair 18 September 2020
None on record
Rachel Elizabeth Doyle Trustee 02 October 2024
None on record
Christopher Ledward Trustee 18 September 2021
None on record
Robert Persey Trustee 16 June 2017
None on record
EDWINA SHIRLEY BRADSHAW Trustee 16 June 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £210 £183 £166 £360 £574
Total expenditure £300 £200 £0 £0 £125
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 08 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 18 August 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 14 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 11 DECEMBER 1956
Charitable objects
FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE POOR.(FOR DETAIS SEE CLAUSE 26 OF THE SCHEME OF THE 11TH DECEMBER 1956)
Area of benefit
PARISH OF BROADHEMBURY
Registration history
  • 22 December 1961 : Standard registration
  • 17 December 1995 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
Sweet Briar
Payhembury
Honiton
EX14 3HZ
Phone:
01404841425
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available