Linked charities THE CONSOLIDATED CHARITIES OF THE PARISH OF WESTBURY ON TRYM
Charity number: 201015
Removed charity
Linked charities
- ANTHONY HILL
- BETTY HOLLISTER
- CAPTAIN JOHN JELFE
- CATHERINE RUTLAND
- DR SHELLARD
- EDWARD HARRIS
- EDWARD WADE
- ELIZABETH HELLEN
- GEORGE GRANT
- GEORGE WEBB
- HUMPHREY BROWN
- JOAN STAINER
- JOHN KNIGHT
- JOHN MORGAN
- JOHN WASTBURROWS
- LADY CANN
- MARY COMBES
- MARY INNYS (OTHERWISE JERYS)
- MARY JACKSON
- MARY WHITE
- MINISTER'S FUND
- PETER DOWDING
- ROBERT ARDEN
- ROBERT KITCHEN
- ROBERT WOOD
- SIR RICHARD HILL
- SIR ROBERT YEAMANS
- THOMAS AND ANNE HORT
- THOMAS ELBRIDGE
- THOMAS TILL ADAMS
- WILLIAM BURGES
- WILLIAM COOKE
- WILLIAM LUCAS
- WILLIAM WHITE
Governing document
SCHEME OF 3 DECEMBER 1880 AS AMENDED BY SCHEMES OF 10 MAY 1962 AND 7 MARCH 1974
Charitable objects
(A) PAYMENT TO THE VICAR (B) PAYMENT TO THE INCUMBENT (C) PAYMENT TO THE PARISH CLERK (D) PAYMENT TO THE BELL RINGERS (E) FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE POOR
Area of benefit
PARISH OF WESTBURY-UPON-TRYM
Registration history
- 13 March 1962 : Standard registration
- 14 October 2005 : Removed
- 14 October 2005 : Asset transfer out
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.