GOOD NEIGHBOURS AMERSHAM AND DISTRICT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To improve the quality of life of the elderly in Amersham and District.(Amersham Chesham & Little Chalfont Specifically we run 2 lunch-clubs and have for more than 20 years provided transport for the disabled( both wheelchair & those with assisted mobility) for these clubs , a third party charity who specialism is dementia, & a ladies mid week worship group.We also run a befriending service
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 11 November 1961: Standard registration
- AGE CONCERN - AMERSHAM AND DISTRICT (Working name)
- AGE CONCERN - AMERSHAM AND DISTRICT (Previous name)
- AMERSHAM AND DISTRICT OLD PEOPLES WELFARE COMMITTEE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Russell John Soden | Trustee | 05 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Richard East | Trustee | 05 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elaine Fisher | Trustee | 05 October 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.98k | £3.28k | £3.10k | £5.31k | £6.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.11k | £2.05k | £2.05k | £5.76k | £7.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 May 2024 | 96 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 March 2023 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 February 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 APR 1961 AS AMENDED ON 23 APR 2002 AS AMENDED ON 03 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF THE ELDERLY PEOPLE IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE IN AND AROUND AMERSHAM AND LITTLE CHALFONT (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE AREA OF BENEFIT)
Area of benefit
AMERSHAM AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
98 WOODSIDE ROAD
AMERSHAM
HP6 6AP
- Phone:
- 01494433257
- Email:
- MILESTONES98@NTLWORLD.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window