THE PARISH LANDS AND OTHER CHARITIES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
It provides housing and accomodation and Grants for education to young people, the elderly and people with diabilities who live in the area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
Governance
- 12 January 1962: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROGER GRAHAM BROOM | Chair | 05 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Robert Arthur Scott | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Ernest George Michael Beard | Trustee | 22 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Poppy Christine Rogers | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Andrew Bruce | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sally Jayne Elizabeth Mills | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Gill | Trustee | 22 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Gordon Richard Pym | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Hodgin | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
ROMA MARY KATHLEEN MEYERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DEBORAH SARAH CAROLINE YARDE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £68.43k | £268.46k | £74.98k | £83.68k | £84.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £143.16k | £109.34k | £265.95k | £133.19k | £65.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 6 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 6 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 21 June 2024 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 21 June 2024 | 52 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 23 June 2023 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 23 June 2023 | 54 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 13 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 13 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 12 May 2021 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 12 May 2021 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SEE INDIVIDUAL CONSTITUENTS
Charitable objects
SEE INDIVIDUAL CONSTITUENTS
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF ST. SIDWELL
Linked charities
- CHAMBER OF EXETER
- HARRIET EDWINA DRAKE
- HESTER BUSSEL
- JOHN CHEEKE
- JOHN MOFFATT
- JOHN WEBB
- LAWRENCE SELDON
- MARIA ELIZABETH NOSWORTHY
- MARY ANNE FRANKLIN
- MARY ANNE FRANKLIN (ST MATTHEW, NEWTOWN)
- MARY ARTHUR
- RALPH HERMAN
- SARAH BROWN
- SIR JOHN ACLAND
- ST SIDWELL PARISH LANDS
- T COLLYNS LAUD
- THOMAS BUSSEL
- THOMAS SMALLRIDGE
- THOMAS TOOKER
- UNITED CHARITY OF BAKER AND SANDFORD
- 12 January 1962 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 Blackboy Road
EXETER
EX4 6ST
- Phone:
- 01392980784
- Email:
- tltancock@icloud.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window