THE SIDNEY HILL CHURCHILL WESLEYAN COTTAGE HOMES

Charity number: 201051
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of housing for people in housing need aged 50 or over. The housing is provided in 12 almshouse cottage homes in Churchill, North Somerset. Preference is given to applicants in financial need and from, or with, connections with this area.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £93,304
Total expenditure: £103,603

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Bath And North East Somerset
  • Bristol City
  • North Somerset
  • Somerset
  • South Gloucestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 January 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • SIDNEY HILL COTTAGE HOMES (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christopher Williamson Trustee 20 February 2024
THE VICTORIA JUBILEE LANGFORD HOMES
Received: On time
CHARLES GRAHAM STONE'S RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
Roger Humm Trustee 20 November 2023
THE VICTORIA JUBILEE LANGFORD HOMES
Received: On time
CHARLES GRAHAM STONE'S RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
Stuart Martin Seel Trustee 14 April 2023
THE VICTORIA JUBILEE LANGFORD HOMES
Received: On time
CHARLES GRAHAM STONE'S RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
BRIAN PRICE Trustee 14 April 2023
THE VICTORIA JUBILEE LANGFORD HOMES
Received: On time
CHARLES GRAHAM STONE'S RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
RUTH THOMAS Trustee 23 April 2021
THE SIMON SIDNEY HILL HALL CHARITY
Received: On time
SOMERSET MENDIP CIRCUIT - METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
THE VICTORIA JUBILEE LANGFORD HOMES
Received: On time
CHARLES GRAHAM STONE'S RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
CHURCHILL METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Helen Janet Brown Trustee 23 April 2021
CHARLES GRAHAM STONE'S RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
ANN PURSEY Trustee
CHARLES GRAHAM STONE'S RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
THE VICTORIA JUBILEE LANGFORD HOMES
Received: On time
VINE COUNSELLING SERVICES
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £75.51k £75.64k £77.21k £75.44k £93.30k
Total expenditure £50.56k £53.90k £97.98k £79.42k £103.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 22 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 23 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 18 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 20 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 29 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 29 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 07 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 07 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 26 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Boardroom
Sidney Hill Cottage Homes
Front Street
Churchill
Somerset
BS25 5NE
Phone:
07934415809
Website:

No information available