Financial history POTTON CONSOLIDATED CHARITY

Charity number: 201073
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £152.90k £157.81k £161.90k £157.41k £175.36k
Total expenditure £172.28k £144.09k £200.14k £171.39k £148.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £4.00k N/A