Trustees POTTON CONSOLIDATED CHARITY
Charity number: 201073

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHARLES BELCHER | Chair | 29 September 2008 |
|
|
||||
Rev Alex Wheatley | Trustee | 04 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Terry Woods | Trustee | 19 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
George Howe | Trustee | 05 November 2018 |
|
|||||
ANNA ADNITT | Trustee | 05 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANGUS MacDONALD | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANDRE ALLISON | Trustee | 14 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL O'KEEFE | Trustee | 14 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
Alan Leggatt | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.