HAMPSHIRE AND ISLE OF WIGHT WILDLIFE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust exists to advance, promote and further conservation maintenance and protection of wildlife and its habitats, places of natural beauty, places of zoological, botanical, geographical, archaeological or scientific interest and features of landscape with geological, physiographical or amenity value in particular, but not exclusively in ways that further biodiversity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£11,734,507
Donations and legacies | £2.09m | |
Charitable activities | £9.23m | |
Other trading activities | £307.01k | |
Investments | £97.75k | |
Other | £2.15k |
Total expenditure:
£7,249,077
Raising funds | £832.45k | |
Charitable activities | £6.42m | |
Other | £0 |
£417,339 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £1,570,982 from 95 government contract(s) and £375,880 from 35 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £832.45k | |
Charitable expenditure | £6.42m | |
Retained for future use | £4.49m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £832.45k | |
Charitable expenditure | £6.42m | |
Retained for future use | £4.90m |
People

103 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
1466 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Hampshire
- Isle Of Wight
Governance
- 22 December 1961: Standard registration
- 23 April 2015: Funds received from 1106609 THE HANSON CONCRETE CHARITABLE TRUST
- HAMPSHIRE WILDLIFE TRUST (Working name)
- HAMPSHIRE AND ISLE OF WIGHT NATURALISTS' TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
- HAMPSHIRE AND ISLE OF WIGHT WILDLIFE TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Jordan OBE | Chair | 22 November 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Henry George Le Vaillant Gardener | Trustee | 19 February 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Oliver Cooper | Trustee | 19 February 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Victoria Thorp | Trustee | 19 February 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Charlotte Rose | Trustee | 19 February 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
William Vine | Trustee | 05 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Rachel Coyle MBE | Trustee | 05 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Julian Roberts | Trustee | 17 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Richard Lumley Green-Wilkinson | Trustee | 24 October 2019 |
|
|||||||||
Dr Helen McCormack | Trustee | 05 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
Oliver Cox | Trustee | 07 July 2017 |
|
|||||||||
Matthew Prescott | Trustee | 06 June 2007 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.35m | £6.70m | £7.46m | £10.28m | £11.74m | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.82m | £4.88m | £5.62m | £6.06m | £7.25m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £981.27k | £1.27m | £650.11k | £2.98m | £1.57m | |
|
Income from government grants | £320.78k | £504.23k | £1.37m | £382.98k | £375.88k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £967.14k | £1.26m | £765.79k | £3.01m | £2.09m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £403.79k | £280.79k | £399.60k | £229.05k | £307.01k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £4.88m | £5.02m | £6.12m | £7.01m | £9.23m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £38.54k | £37.26k | £38.58k | £27.36k | £97.75k | |
|
Income - Other | £65.23k | £101.21k | £137.96k | £1.81k | £2.15k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £376.00k | £859.11k | £331.65k | £1.92m | £1.49m | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £4.24m | £4.38m | £5.07m | £5.40m | £6.42m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £578.18k | £499.45k | £548.33k | £661.20k | £832.45k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £77.62k | £82.94k | £87.07k | £99.97k | £100.10k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £18.22k | £68.86k | £165.49k | £200.81k | £204.64k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £7.67m | £8.69m | £3.60m | £12.20m | £13.01m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £1.20m | £8.52m | £2.83m | £4.82m | |
|
Other assets | £4.17m | £4.92m | £7.15m | £7.99m | £8.76m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £626.04k | £1.45m | £3.95m | £3.51m | £2.18m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28/11/1960 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/05/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/06/1979 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/09/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/10/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/10/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/10/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29 OCT 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05 NOV 2022
Charitable objects
3.1.1 FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO ADVANCE, PROMOTE AND FURTHER THE CONSERVATION AND MAINTENANCE AND PROTECTION OF; (I) WILDLIFE AND ITS HABITATS; (II) PLACES OF NATURAL BEAUTY; (III) PLACES OF ZOOLOGICAL, BOTANICAL, GEOGRAPHICAL, ARCHAEOLOGICAL OR SCIENTIFIC INTEREST; (IV) FEATURES OF LANDSCAPE WITH GEOLOGICAL, PHYSIOGRAPHICAL, OR AMENITY VALUE IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, IN WAYS THAT FURTHER BIODIVERSITY. 3.1.2 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN; (I) THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICE OF SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT; (II) THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICE OF BIODIVERSITY CONSERVATION. 3.1.3 TO PROMOTE RESEARCH IN ALL BRANCHES OF NATURE STUDY AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF. SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT IS PRIMARILY DEFINED AS 'DEVELOPMENT THAT MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS' (BRUNTLAND COMMISSION).
Area of benefit
COUNTIES OF HAMPSHIRE AND ISLE OF WIGHT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hampshire & Isle of Wight Wildlife
Vicarage Lane
Curdridge
SOUTHAMPTON
SO32 2DP
- Phone:
- 01489774422
- Email:
- clive.chatters@hiwwt.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window