SOUTHMEAD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing a range of social and educational activities for the benefit and social welfare of the inhabitants of Southmead and the neighbourhood without distinction of sex or of political, religious or other opinions . Associating with the local authorities and other voluntary bodies to promote the well-being and improve the conditions of life of the local inhabitants by common effort.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bristol City
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 22 December 1961: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Ducker | Chair | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carol Bush | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alan Bush | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Long | Trustee | 25 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Graham Leighton | Trustee | 22 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bryan Scrase | Trustee | 19 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £77.80k | £52.26k | £64.10k | £53.11k | £49.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £75.74k | £48.27k | £59.09k | £51.45k | £49.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £31.79k | £33.59k | £5.57k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 November 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 02 November 2021 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 November 2020 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 12 November 2020 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED IN 1951 AS AMENDED AT ANNUAL GENERAL MEETING ON 14TH JUNE 1968
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF SOUTHMEAD AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, FOR RECREATION AD LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (B) TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
SOUTHMEAD AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Linked charities
- 22 December 1961 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
Southmead Community Association
Southmead Community Centre
248 Greystoke Avenue
BRISTOL
BS10 6BQ
- Phone:
- 01179501187
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window