JESUS HOSPITAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the charity is to provide almshouses for poor men, not less than sixty years of age and of good character who are resident in the County of Northamptonshire and preferably in the Urban district of Rothwell, at the time of appointment. A total of ten almshouses are available to meet this object.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 01 May 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Robinson | Trustee | 29 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
MARK WILLIAM SPENDLOVE | Trustee | 04 December 2015 |
|
|||||
LOUISE CECILIA MIDDLETON HOLBOROW | Trustee | 04 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT EDMUND BRUDENELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALEXANDER EDWARD GUINESS DE CAPELL BROOKE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £90.78k | £91.02k | £91.60k | £103.64k | £117.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £75.34k | £94.14k | £145.02k | £133.65k | £108.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 23RD MAY, 1865. VARIED BY SCHEME OF 11TH JULY, 1958.
Charitable objects
PROVISION OF A HOSPITAL AND ALMSHOUSES FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF ALMSMEN AND THEIR WIVES.
Area of benefit
ROTHWELL
Contact information
- Address:
-
FISHER GERMAN LLP
Innovation House
Welland Business Park
Valley Way
Market Harborough
LE16 7PS
- Phone:
- 01858410200
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window