STOKE SAINT MILBOROUGH VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are the management committee of the community building, known as Stoke St Milborough Village Hall. We organise entertainment and fundraising events. The Hall is available for hire by other groups and individuals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Shropshire
Governance
- 28 July 1964: Standard registration
- STOKE SAINT MILBOROUGH PARISH ROOM (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin David Scott | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Beaumont | Trustee | 10 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ashley Smith | Trustee | 10 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Billie Urey-Guest | Trustee | 10 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Dahn | Trustee | 01 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN NORGROVE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.17k | £19.46k | £12.75k | £12.18k | £14.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.88k | £22.86k | £10.30k | £10.40k | £21.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.33k | £16.10k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 05 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 27 MARCH 1961
Charitable objects
FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF STOKE ST. MILBOROUGH AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS AND IN PARTICULAR FOR USE OF MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
STOKE SAINT MILBOROUGH AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Penny Meadow
High Leyes Farm
Stoke St. Milborough
LUDLOW
Shropshire
SY8 2EL
- Phone:
- 07816757505
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window