Financial history THE FRIENDS OF THE HOSPITALS OF LUTON AND DUNSTABLE

Charity number: 201201
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £8.63k £2.69k £197.91k £2.68k £18.61k
Total expenditure £619 £162 £0 £156.73k £3.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A