THE HILLIER ALMSHOUSES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
provider of warden assisted sheltered housing for ladies over 60 years old who are of limited means
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Surrey
Governance
- 30 January 1962: Standard registration
- HILLIERS CHARITY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip Stacey | Chair | 05 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Louise Piper | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Ryan | Trustee | 13 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah McKenzie | Trustee | 13 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
ANN DRY | Trustee | 16 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Josephine Radley | Trustee | 17 October 2017 |
|
|||||
Nathalie Antoinet-Wiggins | Trustee | 11 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr SUSAN ELIZABETH SNASHALL | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £201.85k | £197.83k | £194.21k | £231.27k | £345.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £128.05k | £120.33k | £141.30k | £191.73k | £176.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 31 OCTOBER 1995 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 17 FEBRUARY 2005 AND ORDER DATED 27 OCTOBER 2005 AND RESOLUTION OF THE TRUSTEES DATED 6 FEBRUARY 2006.
Charitable objects
ALMSHOUSES FOR POOR WOMEN WHO ARE NOT LESS THAN 45 YEARS OF AGE AND ARE MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND OR OF SOME CONGREGATION OF PROTESTANT DISSENTERS OR METHODISTS, PREFERENCE TO BE GIVEN TO APPLICANTS WHO HAVE BEEN DOMESTIC SERVANTS AND HAVE BECOME INCAPACITATED FOR WORK.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED (IN PRACTICE GUILDFORD).
Contact information
- Address:
-
HILLIERS ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
HILLIER HOUSE
FARNHAM ROAD
GUILDFORD
GU2 7LT
- Phone:
- 01483533317
- Email:
- HILLIER.ALMSHOUSE@GMAIL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window