POOR'S LAND OR LAPWORTH CHARITY

Charity Number: 201220
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provide, relief to the Poor and Needy residents within the Parish of Boddington, Northants in particular but not exclusively by the provision of grants, gifts of food or shopping vouchers, clothing, travel allowances for those visiting the sick, contributions towards fuel bills, provision of facilities or any other form of help or advice the trustees consider appropriate.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £526
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Northamptonshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 December 1961: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • POOR'S LAND OR LUPWORTH CHARITY (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Mark Robert Thompson Trustee 02 November 2022
None on record
Didier Georges Simonna Ramsden Trustee 01 November 2022
None on record
Dr Dennis Frederick Burton Trustee 14 October 2022
None on record
Susan Elizabeth Freer Trustee 07 October 2022
None on record
Dr Malcolm Grant Stewart Trustee 14 November 2018
None on record
Deborah Jayne Sanghera Trustee 14 November 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.62k £1.59k £2 £41 £526
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £700 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 06 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 20 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 12 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
24a Frog Lane
Upper Boddington
DAVENTRY
NN11 6DJ
Phone:
01327262496
Website:

No information available