MERCY HOUSE OF WILLIAM FRY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing affordable housing for 6 elderly widows or spinsters
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bristol City
Governance
- 09 March 1962: Standard registration
- FRY'S HOUSE (Working name)
- Homes England
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DEAN PATRICK BARRY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Richard Wallace | Trustee | 17 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rev Laura Verrall-Kelly | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angela Rosemary Hogg | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Heller | Trustee | 21 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
JULIE ANN BARRY | Trustee | 09 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT NEIL TYLEY | Trustee | 16 October 2002 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.82k | £11.41k | £9.01k | £13.17k | £16.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.93k | £9.81k | £51.09k | £7.59k | £5.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 13TH JUNE 1966
Charitable objects
1. MAINTENANCE OF ALMSHOUSES FOR POOR WIDOWS OR SPINSTERS OF GOOD MORAL AND RELIGIOUS CHARACTER AND OF THE COMMUNION OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND AS BY LAW ESTABLISHED WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE CITY AND COUNTY OF BRISTOL WITH A PREFERENCE FOR SUCH POOR WIDOWS OR SPINSTERS WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY REDCLIFFE WITH TEMPLE, BRISTOL AND ST JOHN THE BAPTIST, BEDMINSTER. 2. RESIDUE FOR BENEFIT OF ALMSPEOPLE.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF ST MARY REDCLIFFE, BRISTOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 WINGFIELD ROAD
BRISTOL
BS3 5EH
- Phone:
- 01179099862
- Email:
- DEANPATB@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window