Financial history JOHN BAKER

Charity number: 201282
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £21.03k £20.98k £21.63k £21.92k £22.01k
Total expenditure £17.91k £20.63k £15.62k £15.10k £12.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A