Financial history THE HORDLE DISTRICT NURSING ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 201328
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £1.27k £1.29k £1.34k £1.77k £1.98k
Total expenditure £1.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A