FARLEY HOSPITAL

Charity number: 201348
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Founded in 1681, Farley Hospital is a Grade I listed building, providing accommodation for people in need in the local area. There are two houses suitable for couples or a small family and six almshouses for single people. There are communal gardens at the front and individual gardens at the rear. There is a combination of onsite, local and remote support but there is no medical care.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020

Total income: £70,856
Total expenditure: £57,953

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Wiltshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 December 1961: Standard registration
  • 23 June 2020: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
  • 23 June 2020: Funds transferred to 1187181 FARLEY HOSPITAL
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £21.79k £28.05k £28.81k £30.03k £70.86k
Total expenditure £29.26k £140.30k £46.77k £12.53k £57.95k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 13 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 13 June 2020 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 December 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 16 December 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2018 21 January 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 21 January 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2017 06 January 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

06 January 2018 On Time

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 8 MARCH 1982
Charitable objects
INCOME TO BE APPLIED TO FARLEY HOSPITAL. AREA OF BENEFIT :- PARISHES OF PITTON AND FARLEY, GRIMSTEAD AND THE LORDSHIP OF MADDINGTON
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Registration history
  • 22 December 1961 : Standard registration
  • 23 June 2020 : Removed
  • 23 June 2020 : Asset transfer out