PADSTOW POOR'S LAND CHARITIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of housing accomodation to elderly/old people of limited financial means.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cornwall
Governance
- 22 December 1961: Standard registration
- 09 July 1996: Removed
- POOR'S LAND (Previous name)
- THE POOR'S LAND CHARITIES (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sian Louise Howells | Trustee | 04 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Chown | Trustee | 06 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alec Rickard | Trustee | 06 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alicia Conium | Trustee | 11 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANNETTE ELIZABETH SYMONS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MALCOLM PAUL MCCARTHY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PATRICIA ANNE MCCARTHY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £63.47k | £61.40k | £64.57k | £338.39k | £174.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.05k | £21.08k | £24.15k | £35.15k | £48.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 15 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 15 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 20 MARCH 1970 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME SEALED 1 APRIL 1997
Charitable objects
1) YEARLY PAYMENT OF 40S.0D. TO THE VICAR FOR THE TIME BEING OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETROC, PADSTOW OR OTHER THE PREACHER OF FOUR SERMONS TO BE PREACHED IN THE PARISH CHURCH. 2) YEARLY PAYMENT OF 12.0D. TO THE RINGERS OF BELLS AT THE SAID PARISH CHURCH FOR A PEAL ON THE 21 AUGUST EACH YEAR, THE ANNIVERSARY OF THE DEATH OF NICHOLAS WATTS. 3) PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF ALMSHOUSES FOR POOR SINGLE MEN OR SINGLE WOMEN OR WIDOWERS OR WIDOWS WHO ARE NOT LESS THAN 50 YEARS OF AGE AND WHO HAVE RESIDED IN THE AREA OF THE ANCIENT PARISH OF PADSTOW FOR NOT LESS THAN ONE YEAR NEXT PRECEDING THE TIME OF APPOINTMENT.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF PADSTOW
Linked charities
- 22 December 1961 : Standard registration
- 09 July 1996 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
Trelynden
Elmsleigh Road
WADEBRIDGE
Cornwall
PL27 7HA
- Phone:
- 01208813474
- Email:
- Jacquibee52@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window