STOOKE'S ALMSHOUSE OR MERDON ESTATE CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides 2 Almshouses for needy cases in the parish of Trusham Devon
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
Governance
- 30 January 1962: Standard registration
- STOOKE'S ALMSHOUSES (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALAN MUDIE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Sam Bull | Trustee | 15 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jacqui Mayo | Trustee | 08 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Holmes | Trustee | 26 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW THORPE | Trustee | 01 February 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.87k | £8.05k | £8.27k | £8.99k | £10.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.98k | £2.63k | £4.81k | £10.05k | £5.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 20 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 09 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 11 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 7TH FEBRUARY 1977 AS AMENDED BY VIRTUE OF A S74 RESOLUTION DATED 19 APRIL 1999.
Charitable objects
THE REPAIR AND MAINTENANCE OF "STOOKE'S" ALMSHOUSES. ANY FURTHER INCOME TO BE APPLIED FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE ALMSPEOPLE. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE GOVERNING INSTRUMENT).
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF TRUSHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
BURGOYNES
TRUSHAM
NEWTON ABBOT
TQ13 0NW
- Phone:
- 01626852487
- Email:
- ajmudie@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window