TINTAGEL HOUSE (SHEFFIELD) LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Delivering:- an educational programme of events inspired by the philosophy of Rudolf Steiner, known as Authroposophy - study groups , workshops, festivals, and conferences. A lending library and bookstall. Advice and information for individuals and initiatives. Granting of loans and donations to individuals and institutions working out of the same impulse.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 February 1962: Standard registration
- TINTAGEL HOUSE & THE MERLIN THEATRE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Harter | Trustee | 02 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Anthony Carlisle | Trustee | 07 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr THOMAS HAMER BOYDELL | Trustee | 15 December 2019 |
|
|||||
JOHN EDWARD JOSEPH PICKIN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.80k | £14.74k | £10.03k | £15.59k | £16.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.59k | £15.87k | £19.46k | £21.86k | £15.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 August 2024 | 194 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 25 SEPTEMBER 1961 AS AMENDED 29 SEPTEMBER 1977 AND 4 NOVEMBER 1999.
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER INDIVIDUAL SELF DEVELOPMENT AND THE SPIRITUAL AND MORAL DEVELOPMENT OF HUMANITY IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE STUDY AND DISSEMINATION OF THE SYSTEM OF KNOWLEDGE AND TEACHING ESTABLISHED BY RUDOLPH STEINER AND KNOWN AS ANTHROPOSOPHY.
Area of benefit
SHEFFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
78 CHERRY TREE ROAD
SHEFFIELD
S11 9AB
- Phone:
- +44 114 2582752
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window