RICHARD CARTER CHARITY

Charity number: 201426
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

RELIEF OF POVERTY IN CRANBORNE PARISH

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £52
Total expenditure: £64

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Dorset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 January 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
The Reverend the Rector Chair 16 November 2016
JOHN MILES CHARITY
Received: On time
ELIZABETH HUTCHINS CHARITY
Received: On time
MISS FANNY RIGBY'S CHARITY
Received: On time
CRANBORNE CHURCH LANDS
Received: On time
SIR ANTHONY ASHLEY'S ALMSHOUSES
Received: On time
Dr RICHARD MICHAEL BROWN Trustee
JOHN MILES CHARITY
Received: On time
MISS FANNY RIGBY'S CHARITY
Received: On time
CRANBORNE CHURCH LANDS
Received: On time
ELIZABETH HUTCHINS CHARITY
Received: On time
LINDA PACKMAN Trustee
JOHN MILES CHARITY
Received: On time
MISS FANNY RIGBY'S CHARITY
Received: On time
CRANBORNE CHURCH LANDS
Received: On time
ELIZABETH HUTCHINS CHARITY
Received: On time
BRIGADIER JOHN MICHAEL ANTHONY NURTON Trustee
JOHN MILES CHARITY
Received: On time
MISS FANNY RIGBY'S CHARITY
Received: On time
CRANBORNE CHURCH LANDS
Received: On time
ELIZABETH HUTCHINS CHARITY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £48 £49 £50 £51 £52
Total expenditure £57 £74 £77 £20 £64
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 23 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 05 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 01 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 07 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
POUND HOUSE
GRUGS LANE
CRANBORNE
WIMBORNE
BH21 5PX
Phone:
01725517676
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available