THE BROADLANDS FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To grant pensions to spinsters and widowed ladies of not less than 40 years of age as the Trustees select for this purpose and to assist such poor girls who are preparing for, entering or engaged in any trade, occupation or profession by the provision of tools, books, payment of fees, travelling expenses or such other means which will fit them to earn their own living or advance them in life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
- BROADLANDS HOME TRUST (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Stephen John Daughtery | Chair | 18 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Rev Canon Hugh Wright | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Julie Fowler | Trustee | 23 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.91k | £8.49k | £8.47k | £9.72k | £11.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.00k | £5.56k | £5.68k | £5.82k | £4.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED THE 10TH JULY 1956 AS VARIED BY SCHEME DATED 13TH JUNE 2001
Charitable objects
1. PENSIONS TO HELP WIDOWS OR SINGLE LADIES OVER 40, WHO ARE IN FINANCIAL DIFFICULTIES; 2. FOR ASSISTANCE TO SUCH POOR GIRLS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL SELECT, WHO ARE PREPARING FOR, ENTERING UPON OR ENGAGED IN ANY TRADE, OCCUPATION OR PROFESSION. PREFERENCE MAY BY GIVEN TO POOR GIRLS WHO ARE PREPARING FOR, ENTERING UPON, OR ENGAGED IN DOMESTIC SERVICE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 WINCHESTER CLOSE
NEWPORT
PO30 1DR
- Phone:
- 01983525630
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window