DEVIZES MUNICIPAL CHARITIES

Charity number: 201444
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The objective of the Charity is to provide funds for: a) St John's Church, Devizes, Wiltshire b) Needy people of the Parish of St Mary's, Devizes, Wiltshire

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £25,583
Total expenditure: £14,474

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Wiltshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 March 1962: Standard registration
  • 12 July 1996: Removed
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Peter Kent Trustee 25 September 2023
DEVIZES ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
David Burgess Trustee 20 March 2023
DEVIZES ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
Claire Blyth Trustee 13 September 2021
DEVIZES ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
PAUL BENNETT Trustee 20 May 2019
DEVIZES ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
STUART MCGREGOR-JOHNSON Trustee 19 February 2018
DEVIZES ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
ROTARY CLUB OF DEVIZES TRUST FUND
Received: On time
JOHN GWILYM JONES Trustee 15 May 2017
DEVIZES ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
Charles Henry de Neufville Lucas Trustee 16 February 2015
DEVIZES ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
Peter Phillip Duckett Trustee 28 January 2014
DEVIZES ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
ROBERT AKERMAN Trustee
DEVIZES ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
DEREK SAMUEL WALTER ELLIOTT Trustee
DEVIZES ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £25.46k £29.22k £25.52k £25.57k £25.58k
Total expenditure £20.95k £13.92k £18.99k £13.21k £14.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 27 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 27 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 21 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 21 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 12 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 12 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 15 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 15 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 03 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 03 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SEE WILTS REPORT VOL.1. PAGES 390 AND 432.
Charitable objects
FOR BENEFIT OF POOR OF THE PARISHES OF ST.JOHN AND ST.MARY'S
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF ST.JOHN AND ST.MARY'S
Registration history
  • 20 March 1962 : Standard registration
  • 12 July 1996 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
CLERK TO THE TRUSTEES
SLADE HOUSE
ST JAMES GARDENS
DEVIZES
WILTSHIRE
SN10 1EL
Phone:
01380736431
Website:

No information available