HELEN RICE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General charity activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 December 1961: Standard registration
- 09 October 2016: Removed (Does not operate)
- 18 October 2016: Re-registered
No other names
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Virginia Helen Antoinette Elliot MBE | Chair | 05 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Adam John Morris Holgate | Trustee | 05 May 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.98k | £2.90k | £2.85k | £3.68k | £16.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.80k | £3.22k | £1.96k | £2.78k | £2.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 17 July 2024 | 163 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED DATED 25 AUGUST 1961
Charitable objects
TO PAY THE FUND AND ANY INCOME THEREFROM ARISING TO BODIES OR PERSONS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Holliers House
Worton Road
Middle Barton
CHIPPING NORTON
Oxfordshire
OX7 7DU
- Phone:
- 01249782975
- Email:
- hrf201468@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window