Financial history J A F LUTTRELL MEMORIAL CHARITY

Charity Number: 201495
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £11.67k £5.11k £5.72k £6.73k £6.75k
Total expenditure £8.17k £8.87k £10.16k £12.92k £7.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A