JOHN WARREN FOUNDATION

Charity number: 201522
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The John Warren Foundation gives grants for the fabric repair of churches in Northamptonshire, Bedfordshire, Nottinghamshire and Lincolnshire

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £29,557
Total expenditure: £28,807

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for being a trustee.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Lincolnshire
  • Northamptonshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 October 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROBERT HENRY LAMB Chair
THE LAMB (WARKTON) CHARITY
Received: On time
Elizabeth Alice Banks Trustee 07 December 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £22.71k £16.45k £24.04k £25.78k £29.56k
Total expenditure £25.52k £26.32k £17.27k £30.54k £28.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 22 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 22 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 21 May 2024 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 21 May 2024 21 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 13 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 21 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 03 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
WEST STREET
KETTERING
NORTHANTS
NN16 0AZ
Phone:
01536513195
Website:

No information available