THE CHIPPENHAM CHURCH LANDS

Charity Number: 201541
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide funds from its endowment for the maintenance of the fabric of the Parish Church of St Andrew Chippenham in the County of Wiltshire and Diocese of Bristol

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £5,645
Total expenditure: £1,030

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Wiltshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 January 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Philip Redeyoff Chair 05 April 2016
None on record
Rev Benji Tyler Trustee 22 April 2024
None on record
Marc Allum Trustee 28 July 2021
None on record
Andrew Paul Wilson Trustee 30 September 2020
None on record
Patience Higman Trustee 30 September 2020
NORTH WILTS U3A
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHIPPENHAM (ST ANDREW) WITH TYTHERTON LUCAS
Received: On time
SCOTT BLUM Trustee 21 February 2018
None on record
Christopher Norris Trustee 28 July 2015
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHIPPENHAM (ST ANDREW) WITH TYTHERTON LUCAS
Received: On time
Jennifer Marina Norris Trustee 08 March 2013
MRS UTTERSON'S ALMSHOUSES
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHIPPENHAM (ST ANDREW) WITH TYTHERTON LUCAS
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £12.05k £10.10k £5.06k £4.09k £5.65k
Total expenditure £10.70k £9.10k £5.00k £766 £1.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 12 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 21 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 03 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 04 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
2 Monument View
CALNE
SN11 0FR
Phone:
01249 812945
Website:

No information available