NICHOLAS SPICER'S CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Making annual grants to their clergy for the relief of need in the parishes of the city of Exeter and in the parish of Halberton, Devon; to any poor Freeman of the city; and to the Trustees of the Charity for distribution at their discretion.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 11 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Devon
Governance
- 11 May 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Paying staff
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fr Benjamin Rabjohns | Trustee | 14 November 2022 |
|
|||||||
Roy Hill | Trustee | 25 November 2020 |
|
|||||||
John Winterbottom | Trustee | 25 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Rev David Nixon | Trustee | 25 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Dr JEFFREY HOWARD COATES | Trustee | 04 March 2015 |
|
|
||||||
THE REVD HUGH HENRY DAVID PRYSE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 11/12/2019 | 11/12/2020 | 11/12/2021 | 11/12/2022 | 11/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.74k | £3.95k | £3.89k | £4.13k | £4.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.69k | £3.83k | £3.98k | £4.07k | £4.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 11 December 2023 | 01 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 11 December 2022 | 13 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 11 December 2021 | 22 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 11 December 2020 | 24 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 11 December 2019 | 20 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF MANAGEMENT SETTLED BY A DECREE IN CHANCERY DATED THE 17TH JULY 1829. PR VOL. 8 PAGE 70
Charitable objects
EXETER - GENERAL BENEFIT OF POOR PERSONS; MAINTENANCE OF ST MARY ARCHES CHURCH; DISTRIBUTION TO POOR FREEMAN OF EXETER. HALBERTON - GENERAL BENEFIT OF POOR PERSONS, MAINTENANCE OF PARISH CHURCH.
Area of benefit
EXETER AND HALBERTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
45 THORNTON HILL
EXETER
EX4 4NR
- Phone:
- 01392431297
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window