Trustees BRUNELCARE
Charity number: 201555

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carol Slater | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM ANDREW RUSSELL | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Leslie Rew | Trustee | 10 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Joanna Makinson | Trustee | 07 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew George Sloman | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Charles Oldfield | Trustee | 22 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alison Hilda Comley | Trustee | 22 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Oona Mary Goldsworthy | Trustee | 19 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Philip Ian Hope | Trustee | 28 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mandip Singh Hayer | Trustee | 15 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Stuart Hooper | Trustee | 13 March 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.