KINGS CLIFFE ALMSHOUSE CHARITY

Charity number: 201574
Charity reporting is up to date (22 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Accommodation/Housing for people in need.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Total income: £58,703
Total expenditure: £45,332

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Northamptonshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 February 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Louise Bowen-West Chair 28 February 2018
KING'S CLIFFE SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: 22 days late
Anna Meadows Trustee 25 March 2024
KING'S CLIFFE SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: 22 days late
Anne Wesley Trustee 25 March 2024
KING'S CLIFFE SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: 22 days late
Steven Brighty Trustee 20 April 2017
None on record
MR NICK EVANS Trustee 11 August 1992
KING'S CLIFFE SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: 22 days late

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £52.63k £51.16k £203.90k £15.94k £58.70k
Total expenditure £45.56k £56.46k £11.18k £212.52k £45.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 26 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 21 August 2024 22 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 30 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 30 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021

(These accounts
have been qualified)

30 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 05 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 05 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 30 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 30 July 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
BRIDGE HOUSE
17 Bridge Street
Kings Cliffe
PETERBOROUGH
PE8 6XH
Phone:
01780470081
Website:

No information available