ROCK VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity carries out fund raising events to run and maintain a Village Hall for the benefit of the local community. These include social events i.e. Quiz Nights, Children's events, Music Concerts, Bingo, etc., and larger events e.g. Rock Show, Wedding Fayres, Christmas Fayre etc. It's also hired out for a number of activities e.g. Bridge, Yoga, Toddlers Play, Choir, Yoga, private functions etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 19 February 1962: Standard registration
- 25 October 2011: Funds received from 1084776 THE ROCK MILLENNIUM GREEN CHARITABLE TRUST
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Thomas Dutson | Chair | 27 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Matthew White | Trustee | 28 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Rodriguez | Trustee | 28 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Steve Wightman | Trustee | 25 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Hall | Trustee | 16 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Susan Hopkins | Trustee | 16 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Richard Hall | Trustee | 16 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Griffiths | Trustee | 16 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Len Pitman | Trustee | 16 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Francis Cratchley | Trustee | 16 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Barry Merchant | Trustee | 01 November 1995 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.53k | £54.14k | £52.59k | £52.45k | £72.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.95k | £58.94k | £47.70k | £62.72k | £49.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £17.43k | £2.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 13 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 13 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 17 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 17 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 02 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 02 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 02 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 02 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 27 JULY 1949
Charitable objects
TO SERVE THE EDUCATIONAL AND RECREATIONAL NEEDS OF ANY VILLAGE ORGANISATIONS.
Area of benefit
ROCK
Contact information
- Address:
-
Main Building Millenium Green
Porchbrook Road
Rock Cross
Rock
KIDDERMINSTER
DY14 9SD
- Phone:
- 01299832971
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window